United States Aviation Underwriters, Inc. v. International Governor Services LLC et al

Plaintiff: United States Aviation Underwriters, Inc.
Defendant: International Governor Services LLC and Covington Aircraft Engines, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00542
Filed: March 8, 2010
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2010 25 Featured Case TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Rule 16 Conference set for 6/16/2011 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/24/10. (msksec, )
June 9, 2010 30 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/9/10. (cbssec)
March 16, 2010 3 Featured Case ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 5/24/2010 at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom A 402, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/16/10. (cbssec)
March 18, 2010 4 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/18/10. (mskcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States Aviation Underwriters, Inc. v. International Governor Services LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Aviation Underwriters, Inc.
Represented By: Jon A. Kodani
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Governor Services LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covington Aircraft Engines, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]