Aragon v. City of Colorado Springs et al

Plaintiff: Jolene Aragon
Defendant: City of Colorado Springs, Pikes Peak Rural Transportation Authority, Colorado Department of Transportation, Ford Motor Company and Avis Budget Car Rental LLC
Case Number: 1:2010cv00659
Filed: March 19, 2010
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Zita L. Weinshienk
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/20/2010. (mjwcd)
March 31, 2010 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Recusal directing reassignment to another judge. By Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 03/31/2010. (sah, )
September 2, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Defendant Colorado Department of Transportations Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; Party Colorado Department of Transportation DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A) (i). It is FURTHER ORDERED that each party to pay his, her or its own costs and attorneys fees. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/2/2010.(erv, )
September 17, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 38 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order. The written Stipulated Protective Order [38-1] is approved as amended in paragraphs 14 and 19 and made an Order of Court. Parties shall use the proper case number 10-cv-00659-CMA-MJW on all future filings. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/17/2010.(mjwcd)
September 17, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/17/2010. (mjwcd)
November 5, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Motion to Dismiss Parties claims asserted by Plaintiff against Party Avis Budget Car Rental LLC and Ford Motor Company With Prejudice. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/5/2010.(erv, )
December 20, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Join Defendant Pikes Peak Rural Transportation Authority Pursuant to F.R.C.P. [sic] Rule 19. Amended Complaint [47-1] is filed as of the date of this Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/20/2010.(mjwcd)
January 5, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion to Dismiss. Party City of Colorado Springs is hereby DISMISSED as a Defendant in this matter. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the caption on all subsequent filings shall reflect the removal of the City of Colorado Springs as a Defendant in this case. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/5/2011.(erv, )
February 25, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of DISMISSAL OF CASE WITH PREJUDICE. This matter is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE in its entirety. The Scheduling Conference, set before Magistrate Judge Watanabe on 2/28/2011, is VACATED, as well as all other deadlines andhearings. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/25/2011. (sah, ) (Main Document 55 replaced on 2/25/2011) (wjc, ). Modified on 2/25/2011 to attach the correct PDF (wjc, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aragon v. City of Colorado Springs et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolene Aragon
Represented By: John Arthur Cimino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Colorado Springs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pikes Peak Rural Transportation Authority
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Transportation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avis Budget Car Rental LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]