Colorado Civil Rights Commission v. Wells Fargo and Company et al

Plaintiff: Colorado Civil Rights Commission
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Mortgage and Wells Fargo and Company
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv02427
Filed: October 5, 2010
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
 
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2010 10 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/7/2010. (mjwcd)
January 10, 2011 15 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 12 Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings andVacate the Scheduling Conference, or in the Alternative, to Reset the SchedulingConference, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/10/2011.(mjwcd)
February 3, 2011 19 Featured Case TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/3/11. (msksec, )
July 1, 2011 25 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND. Plaintiff Colorado Civil Rights Commission's 6 Motion to Remand is GRANTED. Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 1447(c), this case is REMANDED to the Colorado District Court for Jefferson County. The Clerk of the Court shall transmit the entire case file of this action to the Clerk for the District Court in Jefferson County. The Clerk of Court shall thereafter close this case, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 07/01/2011.(wjc, )
October 25, 2010 5 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/25/10. (mskcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Colorado Civil Rights Commission v. Wells Fargo and Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Civil Rights Commission
Represented By: Molly Moats
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Eric Paul Accomazzo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Mortgage
Represented By: Eric Paul Accomazzo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo and Company
Represented By: Eric Paul Accomazzo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]