Hamilton v. Emerald Isle Lending Company et al

Plaintiff: David L. Hamilton
Defendant: Emerald Isle Lending Company, GGBC Investment Properties, LLC, Stephen P. Gallagher, Holly A. Cook, David J. Goldberg, Michael J. Bushell and Scott L. Crosbie
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv02713
Filed: November 5, 2010
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 11:362
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 23, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider Minute Order Denying Ex Parte Motion for Issuance of Notice of Pending Action - Lis Pendens, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/23/10.(ebs, )
November 30, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for Expedited Order to Reconsider Minute Order Denying Ex Parte Motion for Issuance of Notice of Pending Action - Lis Pendens 11 is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/30/2010.(sah, )
January 24, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER. A Scheduling/ Planning Conference is set for 3/1/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/24/2011. (sah, )
November 10, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. A Scheduling and Planning Conference is set for 2/8/2011 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/10/2010. (sah, )
March 1, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/20/2012 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Four (4) day Bench Trial set for 1/23/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/1/11. (rebsec, )
March 1, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. A settlement conference is hereby scheduled in this case for 6/13/2011 in Courtroom C-201, Second Floor of the Byron Rogers U.S. Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The conference will begin at 1:30 p.m. and end no later than 5:00 p.m. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/1/2011. (sah, )
March 11, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended ORDER Setting Settlement Conference for 7/12/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/11/11. (mnf, )
May 13, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Defendants Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 11(b) and Request for Attorneys Fees and Costs 57 is DENIED without prejudice as premature. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/13/2011.(sah, )
May 23, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 65 filed 4/6/2011, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED. The objections stated in Plaintiffs Response and Objections to the Magistrate Judges Proposed Findings and Recommendations 74 filed 5/2/2011, are OVERRULED. Defendants Motion To Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment 23 filed 1/7/2011, is GRANTED IN PART. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, the clerk of the court is DIRECTED to close this case administratively, subject to reopening for good cause shown at the conclusion of the parallel state court proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/23/2011.(sah, )
May 23, 2011 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Final Order and Certification for Appeal Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 54(b) on the Fifth Claim for Relief 67 filed 4/15/2011, is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/23/2011. (sah, )
November 17, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Ex Parte Motion for Issuance of Notice of Pending Action-Lis Pendens 4 filed 11/12/2010, is DENIED. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/17/2010.(sah, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hamilton v. Emerald Isle Lending Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Hamilton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerald Isle Lending Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGBC Investment Properties, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen P. Gallagher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly A. Cook
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Goldberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Bushell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott L. Crosbie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]