Fresquez v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage of Hawaii, LLC

Plaintiff: Delmo Fresquez
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage of Hawaii, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv02818
Filed: November 18, 2010
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
 
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2011 18 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 16 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Plaintiff and Defendant are granted leave to file any appropriate motion to amend the pleadings consistent with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 and16 on or before 7/29/2011. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/20/2011.(mjwcd)
September 28, 2011 30 Featured Case COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Final Pretrial Conference held on 9/28/2011. Granting 28 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and Vacate Final Pretrial Conference. Scheduling Order 8 is amended in that the Final Pretrial Conference is vacated, to be reset as necessary. Show Cause Hearing / Scheduling Conference set for 11/29/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Proposed Amended Scheduling Order due 11/25/2011. (Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller) (mjwcd)
November 28, 2011 36 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 33 Joint Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference / Show Cause Hearing 11/29/2011 09:30 AM is vacated. Status Report concerning the status of settlement due by 12/16/2011. Order to Show Cause 31 is va cated. Third Party Plaintiff shall file its Motion for Clerk's Default and Motion for Summary Judgment on or before 12/16/2011, or show cause why this Third Party Complaint should not be dismissed. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/28/2011.(mjwcd)
January 30, 2012 46 Featured Case ORDER granting 44 Motion for Default Judgment. ORDERED that judgment hereby enters against Ms. Strock in the amount of $590,128.16 in favor of US Bank on its claim for civil theft. ORDERED that US Bank may seek default judgment as to its remaining claims for relief at a later date by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/30/12.(jjh, )
February 12, 2013 58 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice. Each party to bear its own attorney fees and costs by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 02/12/13. (jjhsl, )
December 7, 2010 5 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/7/2010. (mjwcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fresquez v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage of Hawaii, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delmo Fresquez
Represented By: Joseph Brent Garfield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage of Hawaii, LLC
Represented By: Eric Paul Accomazzo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]