Christou et al v. Beatport, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Regas Christou, R.M.C. Holdings, LLC, Bouboulina, Inc., Molon Lave, City Hall, LLC, 1037 Broadway, Inc., 776 Lincoln St., Inc. and 1055 Broadway. Inc.
Defendant: Beatport, LLC, Bradley Roulier, BMJ&J, LLC and AM Only Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv02912
Filed: December 1, 2010
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
 
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/8/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/13/10. (mnf, )
December 28, 2011 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 81 Motion for Protective Order. The Motions Hearing scheduled 12/29/2011 at 1:30 p.m. is VACATED, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/28/11.(lsw, )
March 14, 2012 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Motion for Sanctions; granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 25 Motion to Dismiss, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/14/12.(lsw, )
May 15, 2012 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: A three-week Jury Trial is set for 6/24/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for 6/7/2013 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 05/15/2012. (rbjsec. )
May 24, 2012 172 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. The parties Stipulated Motion to Set Dates Certain for Pre-Trial Deadlines 170 is GRANTED in part. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/24/212.(sahsl, )
July 11, 2012 175 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/11/2012. Taking under advisement 148 Motion for Summary Judgment. Court Reporter: Kara Spitler. (lag)
January 23, 2013 190 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Defendant's Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Owen R. Phillips 122 is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation 123 is GRANTED. The sanction ordered is set forth above. Defendants' Motion to Exclud e Plaintiff's Expert Jay F. Freedberg 134 is DENIED. Defendant's Supplemental Motion for Sanctions 137 is DENIED. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 148 is DENIED. The parties' Renewed Stipulated Motion to Set Dates Certain for Pre-Trial Deadlines 174 is GRANTED, subject to the Court's comments. (Plaintiffs') Unopposed Motion to Supplement Response to Motion to Exclude Jay E. Freedberg, CPA 189 is GRANTED. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 01/23/13. (alvsl)
June 4, 2013 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Pending Motions: 1. Defendants' Motion to Strike and Exclude Supplemental Expert Opinions and Report of Jay Freedberg 197 : GRANTED IN PART, DENIED IN PART. 2. Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Referring or Rela ting to Charissa Saverio, aka DJ Rap 204 : GRANTED IN PART, DENIED IN PART. 3. Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Interference with Prospective Business Expectancies Barred by the Statute of Limitations 205 : DENIED. 4. P laintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Neighborhood Crime Evidence Pursuant to Rules 403, 602 and 701 206 : DENIED. 5. Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude the Introduction of Certain Audio Recordings at Trial 207 : GRANTED. 6. Plai ntiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Drug Use Evidence Pursuant to Rules 401, 402 and 403 208 : GRANTED. 7: Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Scott Feiwell Pursuant to Rules 401, 402, 403, 701 and 702 211 : GRANTED. 8. Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Jerry Murdock Pursuant to Rule 37 212 : DENIED. 9. Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Regas Christou's Personal Financial Information Pursuant to Rules 401, 402 and 403 213 : GRANTED. 10. Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Untimely Supplementa l Document Production 247 : DENIED. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 06/04/13. (alvsl)
July 10, 2013 295 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulation and Order Regarding Custody of Exhibits and Depositions by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/10/13. (lag)
March 31, 2014 304 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 297 Motion for Attorney Fees, as indicated in the attached order, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/31/2014.(trlee, )
February 10, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Beatports Motion for Protective Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c). The Scheduling Conference set for March 8, 2011 will proceed as scheduled and all deadlines set in the Order Setting Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/10/2011.(erv, )
May 10, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/10/2011. (erv, )
June 8, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 68 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/8/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1)(kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Christou et al v. Beatport, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regas Christou
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Vail
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.M.C. Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Vail
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bouboulina, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Vail
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molon Lave
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Vail
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Hall, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Vail
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1037 Broadway, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Vail
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 776 Lincoln St., Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Vail
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1055 Broadway. Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Vail
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beatport, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Roulier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMJ&J, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AM Only Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]