Sneed v. PNC Bank, National Association et al

Plaintiff: Marla D. Sneed
Defendant: PNC Bank, National Association, American United Mortgage, First Colorado Mortgage Corporation, Nations Banc, Bank of America, Residential Acceptance Network, National City Mortgage and Bank of the West
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv03016
Filed: December 14, 2010
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2011 18 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 15 Motion for Discovery, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/6/2011.(mjwcd)
January 10, 2011 20 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/10/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/10/2011. (mjwcd)
January 10, 2011 21 Featured Case ORDER. The plaintiffs letter 6 , read as a motion for temporary restraining order, is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/10/2011.(sah, )
March 10, 2011 35 Featured Case TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 2/17/2012 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Three (3) day Bench Trial set for 2/21/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/10/11. (rebsec, )
March 10, 2011 36 Featured Case Minute Entry for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/10/2011. Discovery due by 9/16/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 10/17/2011. Settlement Conference set for 5/4/2011 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/12/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2011 8:30 AM in Courtroom A502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Motion for Discovery 29 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (FTR: Laura Galera) (lag)
March 14, 2011 38 Featured Case ORDER. The plaintiffs motion for temporary restraining order 3 is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/14/2011.(sah, )
May 4, 2011 46 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 41 Motion for Leave to File Response to Defendants PNC Bank, N.A., and National City Mortgage Reply, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/4/11.(lsw, )
November 4, 2011 59 Featured Case ORDER. The Unopposed Motion of Defendants PNC Bank, N.A. and National City Mortgage to Vacate Trial Date and Stay the Case 57 is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/4/2011.(sah, )
December 22, 2010 5 Featured Case ORDER DRAWING CASE. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/22/2010. (sah, )
February 28, 2012 61 Featured Case ORDER. The Recommendation on Motion of Defendants PNC Bank, NationalAssociation, and National City Mortgage To Dismiss Plaintiffs ComplaintPursuant To FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) (Docket No. 31) 48 filed 9/7/2011, isAPPROVED and ADOPTED. The plainti ffs objections 55 to the recommendation are OVERRULED. The Motion of Defendants PNC Bank, National Association, andNational City Mortgage To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint Pursuant To FED. R. CIV.P. 12(b)(6) 31 filed 3/3/2011, is GRANTED. Under F ED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6), the plaintiffs claims against defendants, PNC Bank, National Association, and National City Mortgage, are DISMISSED. JUDGMENT SHALL ENTER in favor of the defendants, PNC Bank, National Association, American United Mortgage, First Colorado Mortgage Corporation, Nations Banc, Bank of America, Residential Acceptance Network, National City Mortgage, and Bank of the West. The defendants are AWARDED their costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/28/2012.(sah, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sneed v. PNC Bank, National Association et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marla D. Sneed
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, National Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American United Mortgage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Colorado Mortgage Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nations Banc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Acceptance Network
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National City Mortgage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of the West
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]