Hutchison v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Rusty E. Hutchison
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2010cv03018
Filed: December 14, 2010
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 2/10/2012 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 2/27/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/23/11. (rebsec, )
September 22, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Defendant's Motion To Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/22/11.(mnfsl, )
October 18, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice 24 is APPROVED. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 2/10/2012 is VACATED. The jury trial set for 2/27/2012 is VACATED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/18/2011. (sah, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutchison v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rusty E. Hutchison
Represented By: Donald Francis D'Antuono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.