Winston v. Brown et al

Plaintiff: Maxine Winston
Defendant: Sandra (I) Brown, Sandra Brown, U.S. Department of Treasury- Internal Revenue Service, Wakefield & Associates, Inc., 56th Avenue Construction Company, Inc., K&H Construction Company, Inc. and U.S. Bank N.A.
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv03170
Filed: December 30, 2010
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2011 16 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/5/11. (mskcd)
January 11, 2011 17 Featured Case ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 3/22/2011 at 9:15 a.m. A Proposed Scheduling Order, as well as Confidential Settlement Statements, are due no later than 5:00 p.m. on 3/15/11, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 1/11/11. (cbssec)
February 18, 2011 28 Featured Case ORDER The parties are directed to confer and to file a Joint Status Report due by 2/28/2011. by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/18/2011. (erv, )
March 8, 2011 33 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 31 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Amend Verified Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that U.S. Bank, N.A, successor in interest to Central Bank of Denver, shall be substituted as a party Defendant in place of US Bancorp, successor in interest to Central Bank of Denver by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/8/2011.(erv, )
March 25, 2011 41 Featured Case ORDER granting 27 Motion to Dismiss Parties Party Colorado Department of Revenue and State of Colorado are Dismissed. The affected parties shall bear their own attorneys fees and costs. by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/25/2011.(erv, )
May 10, 2011 50 Featured Case COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: A Motion Hearing was held on 5/10/2011. ORDERED: The Unopposed Motion for Publication, doc # 47 is GRANTED. The Unopposed Motion for Entry of Default Judgment, doc # 45 is DENIED. THE CLERK'S OFFICE IS DIRECTED TO ENTER A DEFAULT against Defendants Wakefield & Associates and U.S. Bank, N.A. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (FTR: Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
May 27, 2011 56 Featured Case ORDER granting 54 Stipulation and Joint Motion for Dismissal, It is further ORDERED that the United States is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE under Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 and 41(a)(2), each party to bear her or its own costs and attorneys fees. by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/27/2011.(erv, )
May 31, 2011 58 Featured Case ORDER granting 57 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Party Sandra Brown and Sandra (I) Brown With Prejudice. by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/31/2011.(erv, )
August 4, 2011 62 Featured Case ORDER granting 61 the Parties Unopposed Motion for Entry of Decree Quieting Title. It is ADJUDGED and DECREED that Maxine Winston, Plaintiff, at the time of the commencement of this proceeding, was, and is now, the owner in fee simple absolute, with right to possession of the Property by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/4/2011.(erv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Winston v. Brown et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxine Winston
Represented By: Thomas J. Wolf
Represented By: Matthew Steven Larson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra (I) Brown
Represented By: Marvin Kent Olsen
Represented By: Andrea Noel Mahoney
Represented By: Douglas J. Traeger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Brown
Represented By: Andrea Noel Mahoney
Represented By: Marvin Kent Olsen
Represented By: Douglas J. Traeger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Treasury- Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Lindsay Laurie Clayton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 56th Avenue Construction Company, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&H Construction Company, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]