State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. New Frontier Development , LLC et al

Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: New Frontier Development , LLC and Country Hardware Inc., The
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00121
Filed: January 18, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/19/2011 at 03:00 PM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on April 14, 2011, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/3/2011. (rpmcd)
June 29, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff,s Amended Complaint is accepted and deemed as being filed as of the date of this Order. Ordered That the present Scheduling Order of April 28, 2011 is hereby vacated to allow a new Scheduling Order to be entered after the two new Defendants have appeared and the case is fully at issue by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 06/29/11.(jjh, )
August 4, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/15/2011 at 10:30 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on September 8, 2011, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/4/2011. (rpmcd)
December 6, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 50 Modifying 45 Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 6/8/2012 and Dispositive Motions due by 7/6/2012 (see Order for other deadlines), by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/6/2011.(rpmcd )
April 25, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to pay their own attorneys' fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/25/2012. (rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. New Frontier Development , LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Kenneth Galen Gulley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Frontier Development , LLC
Represented By: W. Berkely Mann, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Hardware Inc., The
Represented By: Steven Jay Dawes
Represented By: Kate Lindsay McDonald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]