Nolte Associates, Inc. et al v. Hotel Gold Crown Champa, LLC et al

Defendant: Asset Preservation, Inc., Stephanie O'Malley, Fiserv ISS & Co., FBO Morris Ginsberg IRA, Mahinder Bajaj, Paul Olsen, City and County of Denver, Colorado, The, BK-STOUT, LLC, Joseph A. Murr, Keybank National Association, American National Bank, Riviera Holding, LLC, H & M Mortgage & Investments, LLC and Hotel Gold Crown Champa, LLC
Plaintiff: Oz Architecture of Boulder, Inc. and Nolte Associates, Inc.
Receiver: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00508
Filed: March 1, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David M. Ebel
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:1819
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2011 101 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Status Conference held on 7/29/2011. H&M's discovery requests are stricken without prejudice. Doc 52 Motion for Protective Order is moot. (FTR: Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
August 11, 2011 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Based upon review of Plaintiff OZ Architecture of Boulder, Inc.s (OZ Architecture) 114 Motion for Leave to File a Final Sur-Reply Brief in support of its Rule 56 (h) Motion for Determination of Questions of Law and in reply to the Sur-Response Brief by Defendant H & M Mortgage, the related Response and Reply Briefs and the argument of counsel, if any, the Court grants the motion. By Judge David M. Ebel on 8/11/2011.(sah, )
January 6, 2012 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Court denies the Motion with respect to the removals procedural defect but defers judgment on whether to remand based on a lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 12 U.S.C. § 1819(b)(2)(D). By Judge David M. Ebel on 1/6/2012.(sah, )
March 15, 2012 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Motion to Remand to State Court. For the reasons discussed below, the Court GRANTS OZs motion to remand and leaves other pending motions in this litigation to be addressed in state court. The Court hereby REMANDS this case to the District Court for the City and County of Denver.By Judge David M. Ebel on 3/15/2012.(sahsl, )
March 14, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. The Federal Deposit Insurance Corporations, in its capacity as Receiver for Defendant FirsTier Bank, Renewed Motion to Substitute FDIC as Receiver for Defendant FirsTier Bank, Renewed Request for 90 Day Stay of Proceedings under 12 U.S. C. § 1821(d)(12), and Request for Forthwith Consideration 24 is GRANTED. Pursuant to 12 U.S.C. §1821(d)(12), all proceedings in the above-captioned case are hereby stayed for a 90-day period, effective beginning the date of this order. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/14/2011.(sah, )
March 22, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. Defendant BK-Stout, LLCs Motion to Remove/Turn Off Notification of Defendant BK-Stout from Mailing/Service List 35 is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 03/22/2011.(sah, )
March 30, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. The Motion to Withdraw as Counsel 41 , is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/30/2011.(sah, )
March 4, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. A Scheduling and Plannning Conference is set for 4/18/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/4/2011. (sah, )
July 21, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Response to Oz Architecture of Boulder, Inc.'s Motion for Determination of Questions of Law. The Sur- Response attached as Exhibit A to the Motion is hereby accepted for filing. by Judge David M. Ebel on 07/21/11.(jjh, )
March 8, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporations, in its capacity as Receiver for Defendant FirsTier Bank, Motion to Substitute FDIC as Receiver for Defendant FirsTier Bank and Request for 90 Day Stay of Proceedings under 12 U.S.C. § 1821(d)(12) filed 3/7/2011 7 is DENIED without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/8/2011.(sah, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nolte Associates, Inc. et al v. Hotel Gold Crown Champa, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset Preservation, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick A. Wheeler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiserv ISS & Co.
Represented By: Thomas D. Leland
Represented By: Stephen Kent Dexter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBO Morris Ginsberg IRA
Represented By: Stephen Kent Dexter
Represented By: Thomas D. Leland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahinder Bajaj
Represented By: Gregory A. Goodman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Olsen
Represented By: Chris G. Baumgartner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver, Colorado, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BK-STOUT, LLC
Represented By: Amanda Holland Halstead
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Murr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keybank National Association
Represented By: Erick Steven Arriola
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Bank
Represented By: Neal Keith Dunning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riviera Holding, LLC
Represented By: Gregory A. Goodman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H & M Mortgage & Investments, LLC
Represented By: Thomas D. Leland
Represented By: Stephen Kent Dexter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotel Gold Crown Champa, LLC
Represented By: Eric Edward Torgersen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oz Architecture of Boulder, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Dee Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nolte Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Murr
Represented By: Daniel R. Delaney
Represented By: Jessica Marie Debroisse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Rebecca Reynolds Messall
Represented By: Dennis M. Young
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]