McCarty v. Dunn

Plaintiff: Todd M. McCarty
Defendant: David Dunn
Case Number: 1:2011cv00543
Filed: March 4, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 3/2/2012 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 3/19/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/18/11. (rebsec, )
June 20, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. A Motion to Withdraw as Attorneys for Defendant David Dunn do 15 is GRANTED and attorneys Justin D. Cumming and Joshua Bugos are relieved of any further representation of Defendant Dunn. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/20/2011.(sah, )
August 3, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Joint 21 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/3/11.(cbssec)
August 24, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 8/24/2011. Parties shall submit copies of agreement and contract directly to Magistrate Judge Shaffer within 10 days. 24 Motion to Stay is held in abeyance. (FTR: Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
September 9, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE. The Joint Motion To Administratively Close This Action 28 filed 9/8/2011, is GRANTED. The Trial Preparation Conference set for March 2, 2012, and the jury trial set to commence March 19, 2012, are VACATED. Any pen ding motion is DENIED as moot. Under D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, this action is CLOSED ADMINISTRATIVELY. under D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, the clerk is DIRECTED to close this civil action administratively, subject to reopening for good cause. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/9/2011.(sah, )
November 14, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Granting 36 Motion To Reopen This Action and Dismiss it With Prejudice. This action is now DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/14/12. (kfinn, )
March 8, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. A Scheduling and Planning Conference is set for 5/18/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/8/2011. (sah, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCarty v. Dunn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd M. McCarty
Represented By: Matthew D. Collins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Dunn
Represented By: Joshua Fredrick Bugos
Represented By: Justin David Cumming
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]