Schader v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Robert K. Schader
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Aurora Loan Services LLC and Richard D. Gebhardt
Case Number: 1:2011cv00546
Filed: March 4, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Dismissal of Defendant Richard D. Gebhardt. Richard D. Gebhardt terminated. The caption on all subsequent filings shall reflect the removal of Richard D. Gebhardt, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/20/11.(lsw, )
August 3, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 23 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery and Proceedings Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/3/2011.(mjwcd)
November 3, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., and Aurora Loan Services, LLC. The claims against those two Defendants are dismissed with prejudice, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/3/11.(lsw, )
March 30, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/30/2011. (mjwcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schader v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert K. Schader
Represented By: James Errell Young
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Grant Siler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services LLC
Represented By: Jamie Grant Siler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D. Gebhardt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]