Milano et al v. OppenheimerFunds, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Robert Milano and Judith Milano
Defendant: OppenheimerFunds, Inc., OppenheimerFunds Distributor, Inc. and Angelo Manioudakis
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00600
Filed: March 10, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2011 11 Featured Case ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND STAY. This case is consolidated for discovery only with 09-cv-00386-JLK-KMT and 09-cv-001186-JLK-KMT. Case is stayed until such time as the court issues its decision on the motions to dismiss filed in the Fixed Income Actions. Discovery related filings shall be made in 09-cv-00386-JLK-KMT and shall specify if it concerns the Milano Action, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/29/11. (gmssl, )
February 15, 2012 21 Featured Case ORDER granting 20 Unopposed Motion for Stay. This matter is stayed through and including 04/13/2012. Dismissal Paper due by 4/13/2012, by Judge John L. Kane on 02/15/2012.(wjc, )
March 21, 2011 9 Featured Case ORDER STAYING CASE. The Court GRANTS 8 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Enter Order Staying Milano v. OppenheimerFunds, Inc., Case No. 11-cv-00600-JLK.The action is hereby STAYED until such time as this Court issues its decision on the motions to dismiss filed in the Fixed Income Fund Actions, or otherwise disposes of the case, by Judge John L. Kane on 03/21/2011.(wjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Milano et al v. OppenheimerFunds, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Milano
Represented By: Andrew John Stoltmann
Represented By: David Paul Neuman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Milano
Represented By: Andrew John Stoltmann
Represented By: David Paul Neuman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OppenheimerFunds, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Erin Dunn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OppenheimerFunds Distributor, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Erin Dunn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelo Manioudakis
Represented By: Stephanie Erin Dunn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]