MHC Mutual Conversion Fund, L.P. v. United Western Bancorp, Inc. et al

Defendant: United Western Bancorp, Inc., Sandler O'Neill & Partners, L.P., FBR Capital Markets & Co., Scot T. Wetzel, William D. Snider, Guy A. Gibson, Michael J. McCloskey, Robert T. Slezak, Lester Ravitz, James H. Bullock, Jeffrey R. Leeds, Bernard C. Darre, McGladrey & Pullen, LLP and Crowe Horwath LLP
Plaintiff: MHC Mutual Conversion Fund, L.P.
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00624
Filed: March 11, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Joint Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference,Related Deadlines and Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Scheduling Conference set 6/10/2011 10:00 is vacated. Status Conference reset for 6/30/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/22/2011.(mjwcd) Modified on 4/22/2011 to correct hearing type (jjh, ).
June 27, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. granting 38 Motion to Vacate Status Conference and Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and Set Briefing Schedule. Lead Plaintiff will file an amended complaint within 45 days. The time for all Defendants named in the complaint to answer is extended until 45 days after Lead Plaintiff files an amended Complaint; the time for filing opposition briefs is 45 days after the motions to dismiss are filed; the time for filing reply briefs is 30 days after opposition briefs are filed. The Status Conference set for 06/30/11 is vacated until the adequacy of the amended complaint is ruled upon and the PSLRA's automatic stay is lifted by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 06/27/11.(jjh, )
April 1, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/1/2011. (mjwcd)
November 19, 2012 85 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held on 11/19/2012 proceedings held before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Taking under advisement 50 Motion to Dismiss. Taking under advisement 52 Motion to Dismiss. Taking under advisement 56 Motion to Dismiss. Court Reporter: Tammy Hoffschildt. (wydcd, rrk)
December 19, 2012 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that Crowe Horwarth LLP's Motion to Dismiss 50 , the Individual Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 52 , and the Underwriter Defendants' Motion To Dismiss 56 are GRANTED, and the Plaintiffs' claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/19/12.(jjhsl, )
December 21, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDERED that plaintiff's complaint and action are dismissed with prejudice. ORDERED that Defendants shall have their costs by the filing of a Bill of Costs with the Clerk of this Court within fourteen (14) days of entry of judgment by Clerk on 12/21/12. (jjhsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: MHC Mutual Conversion Fund, L.P. v. United Western Bancorp, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Western Bancorp, Inc.
Represented By: David G. Palmer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandler O'Neill & Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Pamela Robillard Mackey
Represented By: Laura G. Kastetter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBR Capital Markets & Co.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scot T. Wetzel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Snider
Represented By: Marc J. Musyl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy A. Gibson
Represented By: Marc J. Musyl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. McCloskey
Represented By: Marc J. Musyl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert T. Slezak
Represented By: Marc J. Musyl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester Ravitz
Represented By: Marc J. Musyl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H. Bullock
Represented By: Marc J. Musyl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey R. Leeds
Represented By: Marc J. Musyl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard C. Darre
Represented By: Marc J. Musyl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGladrey & Pullen, LLP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowe Horwath LLP
Represented By: Dana S. Douglas
Represented By: Stanley Julius Parzen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MHC Mutual Conversion Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Berens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]