Watersaver Company, Inc. et al v. High Plains Construction and Excavating, Inc. et al

Defendant: Wagner Equipment Company, High Plains Construction and Excavating, Inc., John A. Cordsen, Joette Cordsen, Internal Revenue Service, United States Department of Treasury, Grand Junction Concrete Pipe Company, First Bank and Trust Company and Jim Dible Oil Company
Cross_claimant: First Bank and Trust Company, John A. Cordsen, Joette Cordsen, Wagner Equipment Company, Jim Dible Oil Company and Grand Junction Concrete Pipe Company
Cross_defendant: Joette Cordsen, John A. Cordsen, Internal Revenue Service, United States Department of Treasury, Jim Dible Oil Company, Grand Junction Concrete Pipe Company, First Bank and Trust Company, High Plains Construction and Excavating, Inc. and Wagner Equipment Company
Counter_claimant: John A. Cordsen and Joette Cordsen
Counter_defendant: Watersaver Company, Inc. and Bobcat of the Rockies
Plaintiff: Watersaver Company, Inc.
Intervenor_plaintiff: Bobcat of the Rockies
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00844
Filed: April 1, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
 
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2011 29 Featured Case ORDER : Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/15/11. (bnbcd, )
May 13, 2011 41 Featured Case ORDER: granting 36 Plaintiff Watersavers Combined Unopposed Motion for Leave of Court to Deem Amended Complaint Properly Filed and Unopposed Motion Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 5(c) to Dispense With Necessity of Filing Certain Responsive Pleadings. The Ame nded Complaint of Plaintiff Watersaver [Doc. # 4] (Watersavers Amended Complaint) is accepted for filing. The defendants may have to and including May 27, 2011, to answer or otherwiserespond to Watersavers Amended Complaint. Each partys claim of priority in the property are deemed denied by all other parties, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/13/11.(bnbcd, )
June 3, 2011 59 Featured Case TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 4/6/2012 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Three (3) day Jury Trial set for 4/23/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/3/11. (rebsec, )
August 24, 2011 72 Featured Case ORDER. The Joint Unopposed Motion to Dismiss All Claims By and Against The United States 71 filed 8/24/2011, is GRANTED. All claims by and against the defendant, The United States, are DISMISSED with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. Defendant, The United States, is DROPPED as a named party to this action, and the case caption is AMENDED accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/24/2011.(sah, )
September 7, 2011 74 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT OF LAWSUIT AND DISTRIBUTION OF MONIES FROM THE REGISTRY. The Stipulation for Settlement of Lawsuit and Distribution of Monies from the Registry 73 filed 9/6/2011, is APPROVED. The $282,140.88 deposit ed into the registry of the U.S. District Court Denver, Colorado, relating to case number 11-cv-00844-REB-BNB, shall be distributed. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 4/6/2012, and the jury trial set to commence 4/23/2012, are VACATED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/7/2011. (sah, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Watersaver Company, Inc. et al v. High Plains Construction and Excavating, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wagner Equipment Company
Represented By: Terry Lynne Ehrlich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Plains Construction and Excavating, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Cordsen
Represented By: Don A. McCullough
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joette Cordsen
Represented By: Don A. McCullough
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service, United States Department of Treasury
Represented By: Aaron Michael Bailey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Junction Concrete Pipe Company
Represented By: John Patrick Gormley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Bank and Trust Company
Represented By: Matthew Anthony Niznik
Represented By: Paul W. Hurcomb
Represented By: Kent Howard Borges
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Dible Oil Company
Represented By: Lloyd D. Quesenberry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: First Bank and Trust Company
Represented By: Matthew Anthony Niznik
Represented By: Paul W. Hurcomb
Represented By: Kent Howard Borges
Represented By: Matthew Anthony Niznik
Represented By: Paul W. Hurcomb
Represented By: Kent Howard Borges
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: John A. Cordsen
Represented By: Don A. McCullough
Represented By: Don A. McCullough
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Joette Cordsen
Represented By: Don A. McCullough
Represented By: Don A. McCullough
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Wagner Equipment Company
Represented By: Terry Lynne Ehrlich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Jim Dible Oil Company
Represented By: Lloyd D. Quesenberry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Grand Junction Concrete Pipe Company
Represented By: John Patrick Gormley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Joette Cordsen
Represented By: Don A. McCullough
Represented By: Don A. McCullough
Represented By: Don A. McCullough
Represented By: Don A. McCullough
Represented By: Don A. McCullough
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: John A. Cordsen
Represented By: Don A. McCullough
Represented By: Don A. McCullough
Represented By: Don A. McCullough
Represented By: Don A. McCullough
Represented By: Don A. McCullough
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Internal Revenue Service, United States Department of Treasury
Represented By: Aaron Michael Bailey
Represented By: Aaron Michael Bailey
Represented By: Aaron Michael Bailey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Jim Dible Oil Company
Represented By: Lloyd D. Quesenberry
Represented By: Lloyd D. Quesenberry
Represented By: Lloyd D. Quesenberry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Grand Junction Concrete Pipe Company
Represented By: John Patrick Gormley
Represented By: John Patrick Gormley
Represented By: John Patrick Gormley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: First Bank and Trust Company
Represented By: Kent Howard Borges
Represented By: Paul W. Hurcomb
Represented By: Matthew Anthony Niznik
Represented By: Kent Howard Borges
Represented By: Paul W. Hurcomb
Represented By: Matthew Anthony Niznik
Represented By: Kent Howard Borges
Represented By: Paul W. Hurcomb
Represented By: Matthew Anthony Niznik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: High Plains Construction and Excavating, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Wagner Equipment Company
Represented By: Terry Lynne Ehrlich
Represented By: Terry Lynne Ehrlich
Represented By: Terry Lynne Ehrlich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: John A. Cordsen
Represented By: Don A. McCullough
Represented By: Don A. McCullough
Represented By: Don A. McCullough
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Joette Cordsen
Represented By: Don A. McCullough
Represented By: Don A. McCullough
Represented By: Don A. McCullough
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Watersaver Company, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Michael Sharp
Represented By: John Albert Woodward
Represented By: Christopher Michael Sharp
Represented By: John Albert Woodward
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Bobcat of the Rockies
Represented By: Robert H. Winter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Watersaver Company, Inc.
Represented By: John Albert Woodward
Represented By: Christopher Michael Sharp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Bobcat of the Rockies
Represented By: Robert H. Winter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]