Amerson et al v. American Mortgage Network, Inc. et al

Defendant: Fannie Mae, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., American Mortgage Network, Inc. and Chase Home Finance LLC
Plaintiff: Galen Amerson and Frances M. Scott
Case Number: 1:2011cv01041
Filed: April 20, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Defendants Fannie Mae, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., and JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, as successor by merger to Chase Home Finance LLC's Unopposed Motion to Vacate July 6, 2011 Schedulin g Conference and Reschedule Pretrial Deadlines. The Scheduling Conference set for 7/6/2011 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty IS CONVERTED TO A STATUS CONFERENCE. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/30/2011. (mehcd)
July 27, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 26 Plaintiffs Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/27/2011.(erv, )
August 9, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 32 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Attend Scheduling Conference by Phone, and denying without prejudice 33 Plaintiffs' "Affidavit and Motion to Postpone Scheduling Conference, Due to Failure of Defendants to Establish Jurisdiction and Standing," by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/9/2011. (mehcd)
August 11, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Defendants' Motion for More Definite Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e). Plaintiffs are instructed to file an Amended Complaint on the form provided by this district (and found at the Clerk's Office) for prose litigants no later than August 26, 2011. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/11/2011. (mehcd)
August 17, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 38 Plaintiffs' "Notice of Petition and Petition for Pre-Litigation Discovery," which the Court construes as Plaintiffs' request for production of discovery. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/17/2011. (mehcd)
November 10, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 53 Defendants Chase Home Finance LLC and Fannie Mae's Motion to Dismiss and 56 Defendant Castle Meinhold & Stawiarski's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall submit supplemental briefing on or before 11/15/2011 specifying the Defendants to which they refer and whether their response 66 pertains to one or both of the motions to dismiss. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/10/2011. (mehcd)
December 29, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 74 Plaintiff's (sic) Memorandum in Support of Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/29/2011. (mehcd)
January 24, 2012 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER striking 82 Plaintiff's (sic) Memorandum in Support of Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/24/2012. (mehcd)
May 15, 2012 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 93 Defendants Unopposed Motion for Partial Stay of Proceedings. The Final Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/17/2012 is Vacated. The parties shall file a status report within three business days of receiving a ruling on the Courts recommendation of dismissal docket # 92 so that the Court may reset the Final Pretrial Conference, if necessary, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/15/2012.(ervsl, )
July 11, 2012 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Magistrate Judges Recommendation 92 is ACCEPTED IN PART. Defendant Chase Home Finance and Fannie Maes Motion to Dismiss 53 is GRANTED IN PART. Defendant Castle Meinhold & Stawiarski, LLCs Motion to Dismiss 56 is GRANTED IN PART. Pl aintiffs claims under the Fair Debt Collection Practices Act are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs state law claims for fraud and extreme emotional distress are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk shall enter judgment in accordance with the above and close this action. Each party shall bear their own costs. By Judge William J. Martinez on 7/11/2012.(sahsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amerson et al v. American Mortgage Network, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fannie Mae
Represented By: Kelly Sue Kilgore
Represented By: Mark Cameron Willis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Sue Kilgore
Represented By: Mark Cameron Willis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Mortgage Network, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance LLC
Represented By: Mark Cameron Willis
Represented By: Kelly Sue Kilgore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galen Amerson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances M. Scott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]