Pool v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Shonya Pool
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv01066
Filed: April 21, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Recusal directing reassignment to another Judge by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/11/2012. (ervsl, )
August 10, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing the claims asserted against Defendant by Plaintiff. Denying as moot 11 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Judgment shall enter for Defendant and against Plaintiff, with costs awarded to Defendant, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/10/2012. (eseam)
April 21, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, signed by Denver County District Court Judge Michael A. Martinez on 4/12/11. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 5/9/2011. (lyg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pool v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shonya Pool
Represented By: Matthew R. Osborne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Williams
Represented By: Nadia G. Malik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]