Three Stars Production Company, LLC v. BP America Production Company

Plaintiff: Three Stars Production Company, LLC
Defendant: BP America Production Company
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv01162
Filed: May 2, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: La Plata
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 17 Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference Set 8/24/11, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/12/11.(gmssl, )
July 15, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Motion for Leave to File Surreply by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/15/11.(jjh, )
July 22, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 25 Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Surreply by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/22/11.(jjh, )
January 6, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Ordered that the Motion of Defendant BP America Production Company Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.12(b)(7) and Fed.R.Civ.P19 10 is Granted. Plaintiff Three Stars Production Company, LLC must join the Department of interior and the Souther Ute Indian Tribe as parties to this action through the filing of an Amended Complaint, or if they cannot be joined, dismiss the action by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/06/12.(jjh, )
January 23, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER granting 43 Motion to Correct Scrivener's Error. Order to reflect that the numerical reference to the oil and gas well involved in this case is "Southern Ute 35-1", not "Southern Ute 53-1" as stated in the January 6, 2012 Order by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/23/12.(jjh, )
June 18, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 45 Motion for Reconsideration, 48 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify and 33 Motion to Dismiss. When the stay is lifted the parties may, if appropriate, seek to renew the motions and briefing related to same rather than refiling same by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 06/18/12.(jjhsl, )
December 3, 2012 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, subject to reopening for good cause shown. Good cause for reopening the case would include the fact that the appeal of the Farmer case has been resolved, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/3/2012. (ervsl, )
December 30, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 74 Plaintiff's Uncontested Motion to Reopen this Civil Action Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2. By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/30/2013.(klyon, )
January 9, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice. Each party to bear its own costs and attorney fees by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/09/14. (jjhsl, )
May 20, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/17/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 05/20/11. (jjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Three Stars Production Company, LLC v. BP America Production Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Three Stars Production Company, LLC
Represented By: William Edmond Zimsky
Represented By: Lon W. Abadie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Thomas P. Dugan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]