Borwick v. University of Denver, Board of Trustees of the et al

Defendant: University of Denver, Board of Trustees of the, University of Denver Graduate School of Social Work, Robert Coombe, Gregg (I) Kvistad, Gregg Kvistad, James (I) R. Moran, James R. Moran, Barbara (I) Wilcots, Barbara Wilcots, Walter (I) LaMendola, Walter LaMendola, James (I) Herbert Williams, James Herbert Williams, William (I) Cloud and William Cloud
Plaintiff: Carolyn Jean Gissendanner Borwick
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv01216
Filed: May 6, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2013 107 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and ORDER denying Motion for Reconsideration and granting in part Motion to Review Taxation of Costs. Ms. Borwick's Motion to Alter Judgment (# 84 ) is DENIED. Ms. Borwick's Motion for Costs Review (# 90 ) is GRANTED IN PART, inso far as the Court VACATES that portion of the Clerk's taxation of costs that awarded the Defendants the costs of transcribing the depositions of Dr. Shogan, Dr. Wilk, and Mr. Evenson (for a total of $ 1,137.95), and DENIED IN PART, insofar a s the Court AFFIRMS the award of costs to the Defendants inall other amounts taxed by the Clerk. Ms. Borwicks Motion to Stay Enforcement of the Clerk's Cost Award (# 91 ) is PROVISONALLY GRANTED, in that upon Ms. Borwick posting a supersedeas b ond in the amount of all remaining costs taxed by the Clerk, and this Court's approval of such bond, the Court will stay the effect of its taxation of costs pending the outcome of Ms. Borwick's appeal. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/24/2013.(klyon, )
July 15, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/8/2011 09:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/15/11. (gmssl, )
September 1, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendants in Individual Capacity and Amend Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 15(a)(1). The clerk of court shall file Plaintiff's Second Amended Verified Complaint and Jury Demand (Doc. No. 22 -2), by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 09/01/2011.(wjc, )
September 8, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Settlement Conference set for 1/17/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/8/2011. (kmtcd)
September 9, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/9/11. (msksec, )
May 10, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/10/11. (mskcd)
May 11, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/3/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/11/2011. (wjc, )
March 18, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 58 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 71 Motion to Strike. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/18/13.(mjgsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Borwick v. University of Denver, Board of Trustees of the et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Denver, Board of Trustees of the
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Denver Graduate School of Social Work
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Coombe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg (I) Kvistad
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Kvistad
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James (I) R. Moran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Moran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara (I) Wilcots
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Wilcots
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter (I) LaMendola
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter LaMendola
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James (I) Herbert Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Herbert Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William (I) Cloud
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Cloud
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Jean Gissendanner Borwick
Represented By: Derry Dale Sadler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]