Pavlovic et al v. Galiso, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Mark Pavlovic and Kristin Pavlovic
Defendant: Galiso, Inc. and Charles Grenci
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv01418
Filed: May 27, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2011 26 Featured Case ORDER Settlement Conference set for 12/7/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/31/2011. (kmtcd)
June 3, 2011 3 Featured Case ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/31/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/3/11. (lsw, )
January 19, 2012 44 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Motion Hearing held on 1/19/2012, granting 28 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Attorney Karen Dell Grenci terminated. (FTR: Courtroom C-201) (kmtcd)
February 14, 2012 55 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Motion Hearing held on 2/14/2012, denying 48 Motion for Protective Order. For the purpose of the deposition of Ms. Wagenheim only, Discovery due by 3/2/2012. (FTR: Courtroom C-201) (kmtcd)
August 17, 2012 71 Featured Case ORDER granting Plaintiff's 52 Motion to Strike and denying 32 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction 51 is STRICKEN, by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/17/12.(lygsl, )
May 3, 2013 96 Featured Case ORDER granting 95 the Parties Stipulated Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice. Each party shall pay his, her, or its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/3/2013.(ervsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pavlovic et al v. Galiso, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Pavlovic
Represented By: Keith Alan Shandalow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Pavlovic
Represented By: Keith Alan Shandalow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galiso, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Grenci
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]