Ornellas v. Schomer et al

Plaintiff: David Ornellas
Defendant: Donald Schomer, David Van Sickle and Littleton Adventist Hospital
Case Number: 1:2011cv01495
Filed: June 8, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference 8/4/2011 09:00 AM is vacated. Scheduling Conference reset for 8/29/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/29/2011.(mjwcd)
August 15, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 16 Unopposed Second Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/15/11.(mnf, )
June 16, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/4/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/16/11. (mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ornellas v. Schomer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ornellas
Represented By: Frank W. Coppola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Schomer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Van Sickle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Littleton Adventist Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.