Lenado Twelve, LLC et al v. Western Adventures, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Lenado Twelve, LLC and Last Chance Number 2, Inc.
Defendant: Western Adventures, Inc., Howard Vagneur, Pitkin County, Board of County Commissioners, Larkspur Cabin LLC, Virginia Cerise, James M. Cerise, Carolyn A. Cerise, George Stranahan Trust and United States Forest Service
Counter_claimant: Pitkin County, Board of County Commissioners
Counter_defendant: Last Chance Number 2, Inc. and Lenado Twelve, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv01555
Filed: June 14, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Pitkin
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2011 11 Featured Case ORDER : Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/13/11. (bnbcd, )
December 9, 2012 53 Featured Case ORDER granting 51 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/9/2012.(ggall, )
February 20, 2013 57 Featured Case ORDER granting 55 Defendant Larkspur Cabin, LLC's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim. All counterclaims of Larkspur Cabin, LLC are dismissed with prejudice. Defendant/Counterclaimant Larkspur Cabin, LLC is allowed to withdraw as a party to this litigation ( 56 ), by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/20/2013. (eseam)
April 22, 2013 67 Featured Case ORDER granting 65 Motion for Dismissal of the Plaintiffs' and Cerises' claims and counterclaims with prejudice. Plaintiffs' claims against the Cerises are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Cerises' counterclaims against the Plaintiffs are likewise dismissed with prejudice. Cerises are dismissed as parties to the action. Plaintiffs and Cerises shall each bear their own costs and attorneys' fees, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/22/2013. (eseam)
August 26, 2013 70 Featured Case ORDER granting 69 Joint Motion to Dismiss All Claims and Counterclaims Between Lenado Twelve, LLC, and Last Change Number 2, Inc., and the Forest Service and United States of America by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/26/13.(dkals, )
September 23, 2013 72 Featured Case ORDER granting 71 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Remand to State Court. The Court no longer has subject matter jurisdiction over the case and remands it to the District Court for Pitkin County for further proceedings, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/23/2013. (eseam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lenado Twelve, LLC et al v. Western Adventures, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenado Twelve, LLC
Represented By: John Fowler Neiley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Last Chance Number 2, Inc.
Represented By: John Fowler Neiley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Adventures, Inc.
Represented By: Robert C. Gavrell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Vagneur
Represented By: Robert C. Gavrell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pitkin County, Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Christopher Giles Seldin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larkspur Cabin LLC
Represented By: Anne Marie McPhee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Cerise
Represented By: Anne Marie McPhee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Cerise
Represented By: Anne Marie McPhee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn A. Cerise
Represented By: Anne Marie McPhee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Stranahan Trust
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Susan Begesse Prose
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Pitkin County, Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Christopher Giles Seldin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Last Chance Number 2, Inc.
Represented By: John Fowler Neiley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Lenado Twelve, LLC
Represented By: John Fowler Neiley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]