Dixon v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Randy Lee Dixon
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2011cv01753
Filed: July 5, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 9/19/2012 at 10:30 AM in Conference Room, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4:00 p.m. 9/13/2012, lead counsel present and no parties or representatives of parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/9/2012. (rpmcd)
September 19, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 3/25/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/19/2012. (rpmcd )
December 14, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to pay his or its own costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/14/2013. (rpmcd)
July 26, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/1/2011 at 10:00 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on August 25, 2011, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/26/2011. (rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Lee Dixon
Represented By: Fredric A. Bremseth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Torriano N. Garland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]