Perry v. Red Peak Properties LLC et al

Defendant: Red Peak Properties LLC and Seasons Residential LLC
Plaintiff: Megan Perry
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv01900
Filed: July 21, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/7/11. (cbssec)
May 31, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WIth Prejudice. Each party to bear its own attorney fees and costs by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 05/31/12. (jjhsl, )
August 18, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 11/8/2011 at 9:15 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/18/11. (cbssec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Perry v. Red Peak Properties LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Peak Properties LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seasons Residential LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Perry
Represented By: Siddhartha Hardas Rathod
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]