Kutschara v. BNSF Railway Company

Plaintiff: Bruce Kutschara
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv02080
Filed: August 10, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2011 20 Featured Case TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/15/11. (msksec, )
December 30, 2011 21 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Defendant's Contested Motion for Leave of Court to Amend Its Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Demand. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to enter the Amended Answer located at Docket No. 10 -4, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/30/2011.(wjc, )
February 16, 2012 28 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY for Telephone Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/16/2012; 25 Defendant's Motion to Compel Response to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff is DENIED AS MOOT. (Court Reporter: FTR - Monique Wiles) (klmcd, )
August 18, 2011 4 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 12/15/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/18/11. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3)(gmssl, )
August 18, 2011 5 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/18/11. (mskcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kutschara v. BNSF Railway Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Kutschara
Represented By: Jack David Robinson
Represented By: Fredric A. Bremseth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Thomas Lee Beam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]