Trujillo et al v. Quicken Loans, Inc. et al

Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP and Quicken Loans, Inc.
Plaintiff: George Trujillo and Mitzi Trujillo
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv02205
Filed: August 23, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 9 the Motion of Fred Van Remortel and Jeff B. Smith of The Hopp Law Firm, LLC to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Defendant BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP. Fred Van Remortel and Jeff B. Smith are terminated. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/30/2011. (mehcd)
July 3, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) 18 is DENIED. By Judge William J. Martinez on 7/3/2012.(sahsl, )
August 24, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE The above captioned matters is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Parties are GRANTED leave to move to reopen this case upon a showing of good cause, by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/24/2012. (ervsl, )
July 28, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/28/2014.(evana, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Trujillo et al v. Quicken Loans, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Represented By: Andrew Hawken Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Represented By: Andrew Hawken Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Reiter
Represented By: Richard P. Barkley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Trujillo
Represented By: Richard Michael Gee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitzi Trujillo
Represented By: Richard Michael Gee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]