Federal National Mortgage Association v. Sechrist

Counter_claimant: Amee Lyn Sechrist
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Defendant: Amee Lyn Sechrist
Thirdparty_defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Amee Lyn Sechrist
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv02392
Filed: September 12, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2011 10 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 11/22/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/15/2011. (mjwcd)
October 20, 2011 33 Featured Case ORDER granting 25 Defendant Sechrist's Motion for leave to Amend Response Briefs to comply with the page limitations of the court's practice standard. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/20/2011.(ervsl, )
November 16, 2011 39 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 37 Defendant Sechrists Unopposed Motion to Vacate Requirement of Preparing a Scheduling Order at Scheduling/Planning Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/16/2011.(ervsl, )
August 30, 2012 50 Featured Case ORDER granting 46 Defendant and Third-Party Plaintiff Amee Lyn Sechrists Motion to Reconsider Order Regarding Attorneys Fees and/or in the Alternative Make Specific Findings as to Reasonableness of Removal. On or before September 10, 2012, Sechr ists counsel shall file a very short Request for the reasonable amount of attorneys fees and costs incurred in preparing and filing the Motion to Remand ECF No. 22 , along with a more detailed affidavit establishing the basis for the amount of the Request. CitiMortgage may file a Response to the Request on or before September 17, 2012. No Reply will be permitted. by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/30/2012.(ervsl, )
October 2, 2012 53 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Amee Sechrist's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. After making the aforementioned deductions from the billing statements, the Court finds it appropriate to award Sechrist $2,337.50 based on the work of attorney Joel Moritz (8.5 hours at $275 per hour), and $4,212.00 based on the work of attorney Rolf von Merveldt (23.4 hours at $180 per hour). The Court also finds it appropriate to award Sechrist $27.29 in cost s. In accordance with the foregoing, the Court hereby AWARDS Defendant and Third-Party Plaintiff Amee Lyn Sechrist $6,576.79 in attorneys fees and costs incurred as a result of Third-Party Defendant CitiMortgages improper removal. CitiMortgage shall pay this amount of fees and costs to Sechrist on or before October 31, 2012. By Judge William J. Martinez on 10/2/2012.(ervsl, )
February 22, 2013 55 Featured Case ORDER The Parties Stipulated Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Third-Party Defendant, Citimortgage is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall pay its or her own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/22/2013.(ervsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Federal National Mortgage Association v. Sechrist
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Amee Lyn Sechrist
Represented By: Joel A. Moritz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Sarah Block Wallace
Represented By: Andrew John Petrie
Represented By: Susan Jean Hendrick
Represented By: Lisa Cancanon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amee Lyn Sechrist
Represented By: Joel A. Moritz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew John Petrie
Represented By: Sarah Block Wallace
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Lisa Cancanon
Represented By: Susan Jean Hendrick
Represented By: Andrew John Petrie
Represented By: Sarah Block Wallace
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Amee Lyn Sechrist
Represented By: Joel A. Moritz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]