Baker v. State of Colorado, The et al

Plaintiff: Brandon Baker
Defendant: State of Colorado, The and John Suthers
Case Number: 1:2011cv02578
Filed: September 30, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DRAWING CASE. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge.By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/27/2011. (sah, )
November 8, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re: 19 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/8/11. (pabcd)
November 8, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/24/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/8/11. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3, # 4 Attachment 4) (mnfsl, )
December 21, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 30 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Combined With Response to Defendant's Motions. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/21/11.(mnfsl, )
January 5, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion for Default Judgment, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/5/2012.(jjpsl, )
January 11, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 40 Plaintiff's Notice and Complaint of Clerk Error. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/11/12.(mnfsl, )
January 12, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Motion for Protective Order. Disclosures and discovery are STAYED pending resolution of the Motion to Dismiss [#23] and Motion for Summary Judgment [#36]. Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/12 at 10:00 a.m. is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/12/12.(jjpsl, )
May 31, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 42 Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/31/12.(mnfsl, )
August 28, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The 51 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is accepted. Defendants' 23 motion to dismiss is granted and this case shall be dismissed without prejudice in its entirety. Plaintiff's 36 motion for summary judgment is denied as moot. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/28/12.(mnfsl, )
October 11, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/11/11. (lyg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. State of Colorado, The et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Baker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Colorado, The
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Fero
Represented By: Geoffrey N. Blue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Suthers
Represented By: Geoffrey N. Blue
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Fero
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]