Allstate Indemnity Company v. Intermountain Rural Electric Association, The

Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Defendant: Intermountain Rural Electric Association, The
Case Number: 1:2011cv02650
Filed: October 11, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL/TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE. A two-day jury trial is set on the docket of R. Brooke Jackson to commence on July 9, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. A Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation Conference is set June 13, 2012 at 2:00 p.m. Please see the order for details, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 01/13/2012. (rbjsec. )
October 12, 2011 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) no later than 45 days after all responsive pleadings are filed. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/12/11. (rbjsec )
May 4, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This case has been resolved. Dismissal Paper due by 5/17/2012, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/4/12. (bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Indemnity Company v. Intermountain Rural Electric Association, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Sarah Earle Killeen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intermountain Rural Electric Association, The
Represented By: Kevin Scott Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]