Community Banks of Colorado, Inc. v. 1320 Snowbunny Lane, LLC et al

Counter_defendant: Community Banks of Colorado, Inc.
Plaintiff: Community Banks of Colorado, Inc.
Defendant: 1320 Snowbunny Lane, LLC, Joseph Ash and Barry Ash
Counter_claimant: Joseph Ash, Barry Ash and 1320 Snowbunny Lane, LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv02700
Filed: October 17, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2012 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/6/2012. (kmtcd)
April 23, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Transfer Case. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 04/23/12.(jjhsl, )
October 20, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2012 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/20/2011. (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Community Banks of Colorado, Inc. v. 1320 Snowbunny Lane, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Community Banks of Colorado, Inc.
Represented By: Antonio L. Converse
Represented By: Patrick D. Vellone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Banks of Colorado, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick D. Vellone
Represented By: Antonio L. Converse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1320 Snowbunny Lane, LLC
Represented By: Richard B. Podoll
Represented By: Robert Alan Kitsmiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Ash
Represented By: Richard B. Podoll
Represented By: Robert Alan Kitsmiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Ash
Represented By: Richard B. Podoll
Represented By: Robert Alan Kitsmiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Joseph Ash
Represented By: Robert Alan Kitsmiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Barry Ash
Represented By: Robert Alan Kitsmiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: 1320 Snowbunny Lane, LLC
Represented By: Robert Alan Kitsmiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]