Davidson v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Michael Davidson
Case Number: 1:2011cv02772
Filed: October 24, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David M. Ebel
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 13 JOINT MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE. Clerk directed to close this action administratively, by Judge David M. Ebel on 7/5/12.(sgrim)
June 12, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Trial Dates and Deadlines. Jury Trial set for 9/9/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom C202 before Judge David M. Ebel. Trial Preparation Conference set for 9/3/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C202 before Judge David M. Ebel by Judge John L. Kane on 06/12/13. (jjhsl, )
August 30, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that the trial in this matter scheduled to begin September 9, 2013 is VACATED, and the Final Trial Preparation Conference scheduled for September 3, 2013, is also VACATED. The parties are ORDERED either to file a final stipulation of dismissal or a stipulated status report no later than September 30, 2013 by Judge David M. Ebel on 08/30/13. (jjhsl, )
September 6, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE by Judge David M. Ebel on 09/06/13. (jjhsl, )
December 2, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER.A Scheduling/ Planning Conference is set for 2/28/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/2/2011. (sah, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davidson v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Davidson
Represented By: Donald Francis D'Antuono
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]