Denver 11, LLC et al v. Fireguard

Plaintiff: RAM International I, LLC, Unigard Insurance Company and Denver 11, LLC
Defendant: Fireguard
Case Number: 1:2011cv02837
Filed: October 31, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute ORDER granting 10 Plaintiffs and Defendant's Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/27/12.(lygsl, )
October 29, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER: 13 Second Joint Motion to Amend SchedulingOrder is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/29/12.(bnbcd, )
October 30, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER: 16 Amended Second Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order is GRANTED. Discovery cut-off extended to 12/5/2012. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/30/12.(bnbcd, )
December 17, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to the 22 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice, this matter shall be dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/17/2012. (eseam)
January 31, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : Scheduling Conference set for 3/6/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/31/12. (bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denver 11, LLC et al v. Fireguard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAM International I, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Earle Killeen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unigard Insurance Company
Represented By: Sarah Earle Killeen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denver 11, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Earle Killeen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fireguard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]