Marich et al v. Omni Interlocken Company, L.L.C. et al

Plaintiff: Rudy Marich and Betty Marich
Defendant: Omni Interlocken Company, L.L.C., Omni Hotels Management Corporation and Bobrick Washroom Equipment, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv03036
Filed: November 21, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Broomfield
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2011 15 Featured Case ORDER Granting Motion to Dismiss Claims Against Defendants Pinkard Construction Co. and RNL Design, Inc., signed by Broomfield County, District Court Judge, Katherine R. Delgado, on 11/21/11. (lyg, )
December 27, 2011 29 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/1/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/27/2011. (mjwcd)
April 26, 2012 36 Featured Case ORDER granting 25 Motion to Remand to State Court the District Court of Broomfield County, Colorado, by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/26/2012.(ervsl, )
November 21, 2011 4 Featured Case ORDER Granting Motion to Amend Caption and Complaint, signed by Broomfield County, District Court Judge, Thomas R. Ensor, on 6/2/11. (lyg, )
November 21, 2011 7 Featured Case Pretrial ORDER, signed by Broomfield County, District Court Judge, Thomas R. Ensor, on 6/21/11. (lyg, )
November 21, 2011 8 Featured Case ORDER Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Designate Non-Parties at Fault, signed by Broomfield County, District Court Judge, Katherine R. Delgado, on 7/25/11. (lyg, )
November 21, 2011 9 Featured Case ORDER Granting Motion to File Second Amended Complaint, signed by Broomfield County, District Court Judge, Katherine R. Delgado, on 8/9/11. (lyg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Marich et al v. Omni Interlocken Company, L.L.C. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudy Marich
Represented By: John A. Purvis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Marich
Represented By: John A. Purvis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omni Interlocken Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: Leslie Anne Kendrick
Represented By: Benton Jordan Barton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omni Hotels Management Corporation
Represented By: Benton Jordan Barton
Represented By: Leslie Anne Kendrick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobrick Washroom Equipment, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Charles Wathen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]