Hoffner v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

Plaintiff: Larry W. Hoffner
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Counter_defendant: Larry W. Hoffner
Counter_claimant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv03099
Filed: November 28, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12:1819
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2011 11 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/1/11. (mskcd)
December 22, 2011 12 Featured Case ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 2/9/2012 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 12/22/11. (cbssec)
February 10, 2012 16 Featured Case TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/10/12. (msksec, )
July 30, 2012 24 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 7/30/2012. The court GRANTS 17 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. The discovery cut off shall be extended to August 31, 2012. The dispositive motions deadline shall be extended to October 1, 2012. FTR: Robin Mason. (cbscd, )
November 28, 2011 6 Featured Case Initial Case Management ORDER, signed by Weld County, District Court Judges, on 2/3/11. (lyg, )
November 28, 2011 7 Featured Case ORDER Approving Stipulation Regarding "At-Issue" Date, signed by Weld County, District Court Judge, Dinsmore Tuttle, on 7/1/11. (lyg, )
November 28, 2011 8 Featured Case ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion to Substitute Defendant, signed by Weld County, District Court Judge, Dinsmore Tuttle, on 8/30/11. (lyg, )
November 28, 2011 9 Featured Case ORDER Granting with Amendments Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings, signed by Weld County, District Court Judge, Dinsmore Tuttle, on 9/14/11. (lyg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hoffner v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry W. Hoffner
Represented By: Brandon Barnard Houtchens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Peter F. Munger
Represented By: Ryan P. Lessmann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Larry W. Hoffner
Represented By: Brandon Barnard Houtchens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Ryan P. Lessmann
Represented By: Peter F. Munger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]