Fick v. US Bank National Association et al

Plaintiff: Linda Sue Fick
Defendant: US Bank National Association, Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust, Wells Fargo, New Century Mortgage, America's Servicing Company, Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trusts and Castle Stawiarski, LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv03184
Filed: December 7, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Mix 11 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and Decla[ra]tory Relief and to Stay Foreclosure Sale 3 is DENIED by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/04/12.(jjh, )
January 5, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/05/12.(jjh, )
June 7, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 30 Motion to Dismiss by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 06/07/12.(jjhsl, )
December 9, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DRAWING CASE. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/9/2011. (sah, )
November 8, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Mix 52 , is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complain t and Supporting Brief 36 , is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. ORDERED that Defendant U.S. Bank be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as a party in this matter. ORDERED that consistent with Magistrate Judge Mix's recommendation, Defendants ACS and Wells Fargo must file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs RESPA and FDCPA claims on or before Friday, November 23, 2012 by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/08/12.(jjhsl, )
November 9, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Mix 51 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. ORDERED that Defendants Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust, Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trusts, New Century Mortgage, and Castle Stawiarski, LLC, should be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as parties from this action by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/08/12.(jjhsl, ) Modified on 11/9/2012 (jjhsl, ).
January 15, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER; 55 Motion to Dismiss RESPA and FDCPA Claims, and Supporting Memorandum Brief is DENIED AS MOOT, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/15/2013.(klmcd, )
September 17, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Mix's Recommendation 58 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. ORDERED that pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b), plaintiff, Linda Sue Fick's, claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with court orders by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 09/17/13.(jjhsl, )
September 19, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk on 9/19/2013. (trlee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fick v. US Bank National Association et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Sue Fick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Century Mortgage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America's Servicing Company
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trusts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castle Stawiarski, LLC
Represented By: Phillip A. Vaglica
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]