Niederquell et al v. Bank of America N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Mark D. Niederquell and Judith A. Niederquell
Defendant: Bank of America N.A. and Bank of New York Mellon, The
Case Number: 1:2011cv03185
Filed: December 7, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Rio Grande
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/14/11. (mskcd)
December 27, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/29/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/27/2011. (mjwcd)
March 2, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/2/12. (msksec, )
May 4, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REMAND AND MOTION TO DISMISS: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED (1) The Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand 14 is DENIED. (2) The Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 17 is DENIED. The claims asserted in the Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (#20), as redefined by this order, remain pending. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/3/12.(msksec, )
November 2, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 44 Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order Re: Location of Deposition. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/2/2012.(mjwcd)
February 11, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 defendants' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Notices of 30(b)(6) Depositions, as set forth in the order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/11/2013.(mjwcd)
May 6, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for Final Pretrial Conference held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/6/2014. Granting 74 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Join. The Final Pretrial Conference set for this morning is vacated. Green Tree Servicing, LLC shall be added as a party Defendant. Plaintiffs shall forthwith serve Green Tree Servicing, LLC. Status Conference set for 6/11/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Mr. Schwiesow may appear by telephone for this status conference. Plaintiffs shall inform counsel for Green Tree Servicing, LLC of this status conference date. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss the need for an amended scheduling order due to additional discovery. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (eseam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Niederquell et al v. Bank of America N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark D. Niederquell
Represented By: Erich Schwiesow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith A. Niederquell
Represented By: Erich Schwiesow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon, The
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]