Jakubauskas v. Ecolab, Inc.

Plaintiff: Chris Jakubauskas
Defendant: Ecolab, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv03222
Filed: December 9, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Gunnison
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL/TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a five-day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on November 26, 2012 at 9:00 a.m.A Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation Conference is set for November 2, 2012 at 3:00 p.m., by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 01/26/2012. (rbjsec. )
October 10, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Parties' Stipulation and Joint Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. The new case deadlines are as follows: Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures due 11/12/12; Defendant's Expert Disclosures due 12/14/12; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due 12/31/12; and Dispositive Motions due 1/28/13. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/10/12. (alvsl)
November 5, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for Telephonic Discovery Conference held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/5/2012. Granting 31 Defendant's Motion for Sanctions. Defendant shall hire a doctor who is not a professional witness, or Plaintiff's counsel may have a third party present to videotape the IME of the Plaintiff. Plaintiff shall provide a written discovery response to Defendant's request for production within 10 days of today's date. Plaintiff shall provide his signed disability application to the Defendant at the time of Plaintiff's IME. Court Reporter: Kara Spitler. (eseam)
April 11, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant's motion for summary judgment # 45 is GRANTED. All claims against Ecolab, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1, defendant as the prevailing party is awarded its reasonable costs. Motions ## 46 and 48 are MOOT. Motion # 44 will be held in abeyance for 14 days for the reasons set forth in this order. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 04/11/13. (alvsl)
May 9, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for Hearing on Attorney's Fees held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson on May 9, 2013: ORDERED: The Application for Attorney's Fees on Ecolab Inc.'s Rule 26(g)(3)And 37(c)(1)(A) Motion for Costs and Attorney's Fees Cause d by Plaintiff's Improper Certification 44 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. ORDERED: The Court awards the amount of $5,891.00 in attorney's fees. Judgment Awarding Attorney's Fees shall enter in favor of defendant and against the plaintiff. Hearing concluded. Court Reporter: Kara Spitler. (wjmcd, )
December 13, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) no later than 45 days after all responsive pleadings are filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/13/2011. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jakubauskas v. Ecolab, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Jakubauskas
Represented By: Andrea L. Blanscet
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecolab, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey Charles Klingsporn
Represented By: Jordan Lee Lipp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]