Sloan v. Crested Butte, LLC

Plaintiff: Anne Sloan
Defendant: Crested Butte, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv03234
Filed: December 9, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2012 12 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice. ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for March 8, 2012 at 10:30 a.m. is vacated and this civil action is dismissed without prejudice with each party to bear its own fees and costs by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 02/23/12. (jjhsl, )
January 9, 2012 4 Featured Case ORDER Granting 3 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint and Jury Demand. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand shall be accepted as tendered. Crested Butte, LLC shall be substituted as defendant, and claims are dismissed without prejudice as to CNL Income Crested Butte, LLC and Triple Peaks, LLC, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/9/2012.(rpmcd)
January 30, 2012 9 Featured Case ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/8/2012 at 10:30 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on March 1, 2012, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/30/2012. (rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sloan v. Crested Butte, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Sloan
Represented By: Evan Philip Banker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crested Butte, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]