Garrett et al v. BNC Mortgage Inc. et al

Defendant: Aronowitz & Mecklenburg, LLP, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc., US Bank National Association, BNC Mortgage Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michelle Garrett and Richard L. Garrett
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv03242
Filed: December 12, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Eagle
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 108 is ACCEPTED. ORDERED that Defendants U.S. Bank's and Wells Fargo's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment 99 is GRANTED. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion f or Sum mary Judgment 100 is DENIED. ORDERED that the Motion to Clarify Service Date of Plaintiffs' Objection to Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge [DKT. 111] 112 is DENIED as moot. ORDERED that this case shall be administratively closed, subject to reopening for good cause, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2. ORDERED that, no later than twenty days after resolution of defendant BNC Mortgage, Inc.'s bankruptcy proceedings, the parties shall file a status report with the Court as to whether they believe the case should be reopened for good cause for any further proceedings in this Court or whether the case may be dismissed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 08/26/14.(jhawk, )
August 23, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S 31 RECOMMENDATION. Defendant Aronowitz & Mecklenburg, LLP's 17 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), (2), (5), and (6) is granted, and the complaint is dismissed without prejudice as against defendant Aronowitz & Mecklenburg, LLP. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/23/12.(mnfsl, )
March 7, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The 30 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is accpeted in part. The 22 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants U.S. Bank, Wells Fargo, and MERS and Supporting Brief is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs' complaint i s dismissed with respect to defendant Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. Claims one and two are dismissed with respect to defendant Wells Fargo. Claims one and two survive with respect to defendant U.S. Bank. Claims three through six ar e dismissed. Claims seven through thirteen are dismissed with respect to Colo. Rev. Stat. § 6-1-105. Claims seven through thirteen survive with respect to Colo. Rev. Stat. §§ 38-40-105, 12-61-904.5, and 12-61-911. Claims fourteen through sixteen are dismissed. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/7/13.(mnfsl, )
April 17, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 55 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Take Expert Deposition After Discovery cut-Off Date. Parties are to depose expert Deborah Alex-Saunders by 5/24/2013. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/17/13.(bnbcd, )
April 30, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 59 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order for Extension of Time to File Discovery Documents. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/30/13.(bnbcd, )
May 15, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 65 and 67 Motion to Quash by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/15/13.(bnbcd, )
December 20, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Plaintiffs' 2 Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction is denied. The 12/21/2011 hearing on motion is vacated. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/20/11.(mnfsl, )
June 10, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 84 Move [sic] Court to Review of Magistrate Order as Void. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/10/13.(mnfsl, )
December 3, 2013 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 50 Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony, 73 Motion to Compel Deposition of Expert Witness, or Alternatively, For an Order Precluding the Expert From Testifying, 76 Motion for Summary Judgment and Suppo rting Brief, 78 Declaration and Motion in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Unidentified Witnesses of U.S. Bank and Wells Fargo, and 79 Declaration and Verified Motion for Summary Judgment. The parties must resubmit their motions for summary judgment, if at all, on or before 1/17/2014. The supporting briefs shall comply with the district judge's Practice Standards and Rule 56, Fed. R. Civ. P. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/3/13.(mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Garrett et al v. BNC Mortgage Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aronowitz & Mecklenburg, LLP
Represented By: Catherine Ann Hildreth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas W. Carroll
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Williams
Represented By: Thomas W. Carroll
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNC Mortgage Inc.
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Williams
Represented By: Thomas W. Carroll
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Garrett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L. Garrett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]