Warner et al v. Bank of America NA et al

Plaintiff: Ronald M. Warner and Barbara Warner
Defendant: Bank of America NA, Chase, JP Morgan Chase Bank NA, JP Morgan Chase & Co., Washington Mutual Bank, Law Office of Michael P. Medved, P.C., Michael P. Medved and Heather L. Deere
Case Number: 1:2011cv03297
Filed: December 15, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Motion to Quash Service of Process and Summons, signed by Boulder County, District Court Judge, Andrew R. MacDonald on 5/17/11. (lyg, )
December 15, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Motion for Default Judgment, signed by Boulder County, District Court Judge, Andrew R. MacDonald on 5/6/11. (lyg, )
December 15, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Motion for Second Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, signed by Boulder County, District Court Judge, Andrew R. MacDonald, on 5/6/11. Bank of America NA answer due 5/18/2011; Chase answer due 5/18/2011; JP Morgan Chase & Co. answer due 5/18/2011; JP Morgan Chase Bank NA answer due 5/18/2011; Washington Mutual Bank answer due 5/18/2011. (lyg, )
December 15, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint, signed by Boulder County, District Court Judge, Andrew R. MacDonald. (lyg, )
December 15, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Medved Defendants an Extension of Time to File a Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, signed by Boulder County, District Court Judge, Andrew R. MacDonald, on 6/23/11. (lyg, )
December 15, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of the Bank Defendants' Motion for More Definite Statement and to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, signed by Boulder County, District Court Judge, Andrew R. MacDonald, on 6/23/11. (lyg, )
December 15, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Allowing Medved Defendants to Join Motion for More Definite Statement, signed by Boulder County, District Court Judge, Andrew R. MacDonald, on 7/6/11. (lyg, )
December 15, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Motion for Default Judgment on Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, signed by Boulder County, District Court Judge, Andrew R. MacDonald, on 7/6/11. (lyg, )
December 15, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Defendants' Motions for More Definitive Statement, Defendants' Motions to Strike Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, signed by Boulder County, District Court Judge, Andrew R. MacDonald, on 10/25/11. (lyg, )
December 22, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 2/15/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/22/11. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3, # 4 Attachment 4) (mnfsl, )
December 27, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED re: 24 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/27/11. (amended to add defendant) (pabcd)
December 27, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion for More Definite Statement. ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. ORDER denying without prejudice 23 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiffs shall file their Second Amended Complaint on or before 1/12/2012. All defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint within 14 calendar days of its filing. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/27/11.(pabcd)
March 1, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S RECOMMENDATION. The 49 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is accepted. This case is remanded to the District Court for Boulder County, Colorado. Plaintiffs' 35 Motion to Remand Back to State Court is denied as moot. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/1/12.(mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warner et al v. Bank of America NA et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald M. Warner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Warner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Mark Cameron Willis
Represented By: Kelly Sue Kilgore
Represented By: Adam Leon Hirsch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase
Represented By: Mark Cameron Willis
Represented By: Kelly Sue Kilgore
Represented By: Adam Leon Hirsch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Kelly Sue Kilgore
Represented By: Adam Leon Hirsch
Represented By: Mark Cameron Willis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Adam Leon Hirsch
Represented By: Kelly Sue Kilgore
Represented By: Mark Cameron Willis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank
Represented By: Adam Leon Hirsch
Represented By: Kelly Sue Kilgore
Represented By: Mark Cameron Willis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of Michael P. Medved, P.C.
Represented By: Heather Lea Deere
Represented By: Michael Paul Medved
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P. Medved
Represented By: Heather Lea Deere
Represented By: Michael Paul Medved
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather L. Deere
Represented By: Heather Lea Deere
Represented By: Michael Paul Medved
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]