Crews v. Weaver-Osterholtz et al

Plaintiff: Shannon Crews
Defendant: Dana Weaver-Osterholtz and Parkview Medical Center, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv03369
Filed: December 23, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Status Conference held on 6/12/2012. Plaintiff fails to appear. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/2/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judg e Michael J. Watanabe. Plaintiff shall appear in person; defense counsel may appear by telephone.Granting 21 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw. James W. Avery is terminated. Granting 30 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Plaint iff shall file certification of review on or before 7/2/2012. Granting Defendants' Oral Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Dispositive Motions due by 1/14/2013. Defendants' deadline for disclosure of expert witnesses 10/9/2012. 27 Scheduling Order is amended. (Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller) (mjwcd)
August 1, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER affirming 36 Report and Recommendations and dismissing the case by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/1/12.(dkals, )
January 4, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/6/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/4/2012. (mjwcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crews v. Weaver-Osterholtz et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Crews
Represented By: James W. Avery
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Weaver-Osterholtz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkview Medical Center, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]