Carr et al v. US Bank North America et al

Plaintiff: Deborah A. Stevens-Carr and Dwight A. Carr
Defendant: US Bank North America, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Vaden Law Firm
Case Number: 1:2011cv03377
Filed: December 27, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. Please see the order for details, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 01/30/2012. (rbjsec. )
November 28, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 13 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' motion to dismiss claim one is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is DENIED as to defendant Ocwen and GRANTED as to defendant Vaden Law Firm and defendant U.S. Bank North America. Defendants' motion to dismiss claim two is GRANTED. Defendants' motion to dismiss claim three is GRANTED. Defendants' motion to dismiss claim four is GRANTED. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/28/12. (alvsl)
January 29, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL/TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a three-day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on November 12, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for October 10, 2013 at 1:00 p.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 01/29/2013. (rbjsec. )
January 5, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/5/12. (lyg, )
June 7, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff Deborah A. Stevens-Carr's Response (ECF No. 39 ) to this Court's Order to Show Cause entered on May 30, 2013 (ECF No. 38 ), it is ORDERED that Plaintiff Dwight A. Carr (deceased) is DISMISSED and the Order to Show Cause (ECF No. 38 ) is DISCHARGED. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 06/07/13. (alvsl)
August 26, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Stay and Administratively Close Case (ECR No. 51 ). It is ORDERED that the parties' Motion is hereby GRANTED; it is FURTHER ORDERED that this matter and all deadlines are STAYED to allow the parties to time to resolve their dispu te, including the potential short sale of the property at issue; it is FURTHER ORDERED that since the length of the process of a potential short sale of the property, or effectuating an alternative settlement, is uncertain, this matter is ADMINIST RATIVELY CLOSED pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR. 41.2 with leave to be reopened upon motion filed for good cause shown; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report with the Court every 30 days from the date of this Order until the case is settled, reopened for good cause shown, or otherwise ordered by the Court. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 08/26/13. (alvsl)
January 24, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DRAWING CASE. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/24/2012. (sah, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr et al v. US Bank North America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah A. Stevens-Carr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight A. Carr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank North America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vaden Law Firm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]