Shine v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rebecca Shine
Case Number: 1:2012cv00126
Filed: January 18, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part without prejudice 15 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Stay Litigation. The deadline for rebuttal experts is extended to October 20, 2012. The discovery deadline is extended to December 27, 2012. The dispositive motions deadline is extended to January 22, 2013. It is further ordered that the parties may file a renewed motion to stay this litigation consistent with this Order no sooner than November 4, 2012. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/5/12. (mjgsl, )
October 30, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 18 Wal-Mart's Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order; granting in part 20 Wal-Mart's Amended Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Discovery deadline extended to 1/23/2013, for the sole purpose of condu cting discovery relating to the IME experts. Dispositive Motions deadline extended to 2/13/2013. Responses to any dispositive motions shall be filed no later than 2/27/2013, and replies in support of any dispositive motions shall be filed no later than 3/6/2013. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/30/12. (kfinn, )
January 11, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Stipulation of Dismissal of Case With Prejudice 23 is APPROVED; the Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are VACATED; the jury trial is VACATED; this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/11/13. (kfinn, )
January 24, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 4/12/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/24/2012. (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shine v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Suanne Marie Dell
Represented By: Rachel Ollar Entrican
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Shine
Represented By: Lee A. Berish
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]