States Resources Corp. v. Kauffman et al

Plaintiff: States Resources Corp.
Defendant: Mark Kauffman and Carol Kauffman
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00197
Filed: January 25, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 10, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference and Planning Meeting. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/10/2012.(jjpsl, )
May 1, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: denying 21 Joint Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance Pending Settlement Negotiations. Scheduling Conference set for 6/12/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. The defendants may have to and including May 28, 2012, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/1/12.(bnbcd, )
February 22, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting set for 4/17/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/22/2012. (jjpsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: States Resources Corp. v. Kauffman et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: States Resources Corp.
Represented By: Beverly L. Edwards
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Kauffman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Kauffman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]