Kelly et al v. Marusarz

Plaintiff: Sharon Kelly and Colin D. Wright
Defendant: Alex Marusarz
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00221
Filed: January 26, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2012 15 Featured Case ORDER Granting 14 Motion to Amend re 9 : Defendant's expert witness disclosure deadline is extended until August 31, 2012; Plaintiffs' rebuttal disclosures shall be due September 30, 2012; and Discovery due by 10/15/2012, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/31/2012.(rpmcd )
August 3, 2012 19 Featured Case ORDER Denying Defendant's 13 Motion to Compel Physical Examination of Sharon Kelly, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/3/2012.(rpmcd)
September 19, 2012 24 Featured Case ORDER Granting 20 Motion to Compel Inspection of Ski Equipment and to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadline, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/19/2012.(rpmcd)
October 17, 2012 27 Featured Case ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 11/20/2012 at 03:00 PM in Conference Room, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4:00 p.m. 11/15/2012 delivered in paper form directly to chambers, lead counsel present in person and no parties or representatives permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/17/2012. (rpmcd)
November 20, 2012 32 Featured Case Courtroom Minutes for Pretrial Conference held on 11/20/2012 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Certain Defenses and Affirmative Defenses 29 , is granted as stated on record. Plaintiff Colin D. Wright is di smissed. Motion to Strike Defendant's Expert Designation and to Preclude Expert Testimony 28 , is granted. Three day jury trial scheduled May 20, 2013. Janet and Eric Scharling not permitted to testify because of late disclosure. Counsel to submit revised proposed pretrial order by November 27, 2012.FTR: K. Terasaki. (rpmcd )
November 21, 2012 34 Featured Case ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 5/20/2013 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom A, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/21/2012. (rpmcd)
October 23, 2013 40 Featured Case ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 2/18/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A, with counsel to be present by 8:00 a.m, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/23/2013. (rpmcd)
December 10, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to pay their own attorneys' fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/10/2013. (rpmcd )
January 30, 2012 5 Featured Case ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/8/2012 at 11:30 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on March 1, 2012, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/30/2012. (rpmcd)
February 1, 2012 7 Featured Case ORDER Granting 6 Motion for Depositions before Commencement ofDiscovery and parties are permitted to depose plaintiffs and defendant as set forth in the motion, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/1/2012.(rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kelly et al v. Marusarz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Kelly
Represented By: Andrew R. McLetchie
Represented By: Daniel McKay Fowler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin D. Wright
Represented By: Daniel McKay Fowler
Represented By: Andrew R. McLetchie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Marusarz
Represented By: Carl Wesley Dowdy
Represented By: Gregory R. Giometti
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]