In re: Avery

In_re: William T. Carr, Catherine A. Carr, Odie Larrel Kennedy, George Lester Avery and Kori Leigh Kennedy
Objector: Shariann Summerrain and Todd Brewer
Movant: United States Trustee
Interested_party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Case Number: 1:2012cv00229
Filed: January 26, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 11:0110
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that Ms. Summerrain shall make monthly payments in the amount of $100.00 by the tenth day of each month, commencing July 10, 2012. ORDERED that Ms. Summerrain must refer to In re Kennedy, 06-16033-EEB, on each monthly payment. ORDERED that Ms. Summerrain is prohibited from preparing any bankruptcy petitions consistent with the Bankruptcy Courts prior orders. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall serve this Order on Ms. Summerrain along with all future filings. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall amend thecase caption to reflect Ms. Summerrains current mailing address by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 06/11/12. (jjhsl, )
June 11, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Request to appear via telephone at the status conference. Ms. Summerrain is ordered to call my chambers at 303-335-2170 on June 27, 2013 at 1:55 p.m. MDT. The Clerk of the Court shall serve this order on Objector Shariann Summerrain at the address denoted in the February 14, 2013 letter by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 06/11/13.(jjhsl, )
June 28, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and Adminstrative Closure by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 06/28/13. (jjhsl, )
March 23, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Report and Recommendation and Order Certifying Cases to U.S. District Court for Consideration of Sanctions, re 1 Motion for Order. The reference to the Bankruptcy Court is withdrawn in this matter and Court will preside over this action for the purpose of enforcing the Bankruptcy Courts orders in In re Avery and In re Kennedy and to ensure that Shariann Summerrain complies with the mandates of 11 U.S.C. § 110. Status Report due by 4/3/2012, Status Conference set for 4/10/2012 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/23/12.(gmssl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Avery
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In_re: William T. Carr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In_re: Catherine A. Carr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In_re: Odie Larrel Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In_re: George Lester Avery
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In_re: Kori Leigh Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Shariann Summerrain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Todd Brewer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: United States Trustee
Represented By: Leo Michael Weiss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]