Rags Over the Arkansas River, Inc. v. The Bureau of Land Management et al

Defendant: Kenneth Salazar, Helen Hankins, Bureau of Land Management, The, Keith E. Berger and Greg Shoop
Plaintiff: Rags Over the Arkansas River, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00265
Filed: February 1, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CIVIL ACTION WITH CONDITIONS. Defendants Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Stay of Proceedings 8 is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part, by Judge John L. Kane on 7/5/12.(sgrim)
August 13, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER STAYING CASE granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. The parties are ORDERED to CONFER regarding the preparation of a Joint Case Management Plan (JCMP) for this action, by Judge John L. Kane on 8/13/12.(sgrim)
September 12, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing proceedings held before Judge John L. Kane on 9/12/2012. Granting 21 Motion to Intervene. Court Reporter: Tracy Weir. (babia)
October 2, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; denying 41 Motion to Bifurcate, by Judge John L. Kane on 10/2/2013.(trlee, )
October 2, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED 34 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR PETITIONS FOR REVIEW OF AGENCY ACTION IN ENVIRONMENTAL CASE. By Judge John L. Kane on 10/2/13. (mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rags Over the Arkansas River, Inc. v. The Bureau of Land Management et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Salazar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Hankins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith E. Berger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Shoop
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rags Over the Arkansas River, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Ray Harris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]