Adler v. American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc.

Plaintiff: Gary Adler
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00291
Filed: February 3, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint. The tendered First Amended Complaint is accepted for filing. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/11/12.(mnfsl, )
June 28, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot 7 Defendant American's Motion to Dismiss. Granting 24 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/28/2012. (eseam)
September 5, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that Adler's Motion to Amend the Judgment in this Matter to Allow for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint and to Reconsider the Court's Order Dismissing the Action 29 is DENIED, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/5/12.(lygsl, )
February 8, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/8/12. (lsw, )
March 8, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DRAWING CASE. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/8/2012. (sah, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adler v. American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Adler
Represented By: Jay Toivo Jambeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Maris S. Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.