Madison v. Volunteers Of America et al

Defendant: Suzanne(I) Razook, Mark Tscheller, Volunteers Of America, Sunset Park Apartments, Diann Kunz, Roya Rosado, Linda Fulka, Denver County Court, Matthew M. McConville, Mark(I) Tscheller, Matthew (I) M. McConville, Cecilia(I) Zapata, Larry L. Bohning, Larry (I) L. Bohning, Cecilia Zapata and Suzanne Razook
Plaintiff: Henry Leon Madison
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00333
Filed: February 8, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider Plaintiff's Second and Third Claims for Releif [sic] Set Forth in His Amended Complaint and Jury Demand. To the extent Plaintiff seeks to amend his complaint, he must file a proper motion as set forth above, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/08/2012.(wjcsl, )
May 29, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/15/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/29/2012. (kmtcd)
September 19, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 36 Motion for Additional Time to Respond to Defendants Sunset Park Apartments, Dianna Kunz, Roya Rosado, and Linda Fulks Motions to Dismiss and granting 37 Motion for Additional Time to Respond to Defendants Volumteers [ sic] of American's Motions to Dismiss. The court construes 38 Motion in Oppossition [sic] as a response to the motions to dismiss and not a motion. Defendants shall file their replies no later than October 5, 2012. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya.(mjgsl, )
March 21, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 50 Report and Recommendations; Plaintiff Madison's Response to Recommendations [sic] of the Magistrate 57 are OVERRULED; Defendants' Sunset Park Apartments, Dianna Kunz, Roya Rosado, and Linda Fulks Motion T o Dismiss Pursuant to FRCO 12(b)(6) 24 is GRANTED; Defendant Volunteers of America, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) 27 is DENIED. Defendants, Sunset Park Apartments, Dianna Kunz, Roya Rosado, and Linda Fulks, are DISMISSED as named parties to this action, and the case caption is AMENDED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/21/13. (kfinn, )
February 29, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/29/12. (lyg, )
April 4, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation For Dismissal Without Prejudice Between Plaintiff and Defendant Volunteers of America 59 is APPROVED; plaintiff's claims against defendant Volunteers of America are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with each of the affected parties to pay its own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/4/13. (kfinn, )
April 5, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants Denver County Court, Matthew M. McConville, Jane Doe 1, Suzanne Razook, Mark Tscheller and Larry L. Bohning are dismissed as parties to this action. Claims two and three are dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/5/12. (lsw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Madison v. Volunteers Of America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne(I) Razook
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Tscheller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volunteers Of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunset Park Apartments
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diann Kunz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roya Rosado
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Fulka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver County Court
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew M. McConville
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark(I) Tscheller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew (I) M. McConville
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecilia(I) Zapata
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry L. Bohning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry (I) L. Bohning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecilia Zapata
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Razook
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Leon Madison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]